Global Patent Index - EP 0933052 A3

EP 0933052 A3 2000-04-19 - Bath

Title (en)

Bath

Title (de)

Badewanne

Title (fr)

Baignoire

Publication

EP 0933052 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99300641 A

Priority

  • GB 9801774 A
  • GB 9813295 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0933052A2] A bath comprising a bath tub (1) having a floor (2), a wall (3D), a door aperture (7) in the wall (3D), and a door (10) larger than the door aperture (7), the periphery of the door (10) in use resting against the inside of the tub wall (3D) adjacent the aperture (7), and hinge means (16A-16D,17A-D), allowing the door (10) to open through the aperture (7) out and away from the bath tub (1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 3/022

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0933052 A2 19990804; EP 0933052 A3 20000419

INPADOC legal status


2001-09-13 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-08-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001020

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-08-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI