Global Patent Index - EP 0933056 A3

EP 0933056 A3 2001-03-28 - Vacuum cleaner

Title (en)

Vacuum cleaner

Title (de)

Schmutzsauger

Title (fr)

Aspirateur

Publication

EP 0933056 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99102018 A

Priority

DE 19804000 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0933056A2] The vacuum cleaner has a fan system (3,4) for generating an air flow and an accommodation chamber (5) for a wet-proof filter bag (7), which can be connected to an opening in the vacuum cleaner casing. A liquid-collecting storage element (11) is connected after the filter bag. The suction air flow is displaced by suitable guides (10) to a flow movement for separating off the liquid particles carried by the flow by a centrifugal action and fed along the storage element.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 7/0028 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0933056 A2 19990804; EP 0933056 A3 20010328; DE 19804000 A1 19990805

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-21 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20020627

2002-05-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020321

2001-12-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT SE

2001-11-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010928

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT SE

1999-08-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI