Global patent index - EP 0933102 A3

EP 0933102 A3 2000-02-23 - Trolley for transporting snow skiing equipment

Title (en)

Trolley for transporting snow skiing equipment

Title (de)

Wagen zum Transport von Alpinskiausrüstung

Title (fr)

Chariot pour le transport d'équipement de ski de neige

Publication

EP 0933102 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98200483 A

Priority

ZA 9800786 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0933102A2] A trolley is provided for transporting snow ski equipments, the trolley comprising: a carriage for carrying the equipment; snow ski mounting means for mounting at least one snow ski or snow board to the carriage; ski boot support means for supporting at least one pair of boots on the carriage; and at least one wheel or skid attached to the carriage on which the carriage may be pushed or pulled by a user of the trolley. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 11/026 (2013.01); A63C 2203/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0933102 A2 19990804; EP 0933102 A3 20000223; CA 2230168 A1 19990730

INPADOC legal status

2004-05-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031111

2003-06-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030428

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980216

1999-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-08-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI