Global Patent Index - EP 0933103 A3

EP 0933103 A3 2000-04-12 - Wheel suspension for skate boards

Title (en)

Wheel suspension for skate boards

Title (de)

Radaufhängung für Rollbretter

Title (fr)

Suspension de roue pour des planches de glisse

Publication

EP 0933103 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99100627 A

Priority

DE 19803412 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0933103A2] The wheel suspension for a skateboard, fitted with four wheels or runners, has a steering linkage arm (3) in a rotary mounting at each wheel (10) or runner, along the line of the skateboard as a longitudinal steering member. The longitudinal steering members (3) are linked to the superstructure (4) by two auxiliary steering linkages (1,2) for a cardanic movement action. The spring suspension (12) is of suitable elastic materials such as spring steel, rubber or foam.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 17/01 (2006.01); A63C 17/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 17/013 (2013.01); A63C 17/0046 (2013.01); A63C 17/01 (2013.01); A63C 17/12 (2013.01); A63C 17/262 (2013.01); A63C 2203/40 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0933103 A2 19990804; EP 0933103 A3 20000412; EP 0933103 B1 20031203; DE 19803412 A1 19990805

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100114

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100114

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100201

2010-10-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100930

2010-09-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100114

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090801

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090129

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090129

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090128

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080228

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-11-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040906

2004-08-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-01-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59907900 P 20040115

2003-12-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031203

2003-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-12-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000427

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-08-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI