Global Patent Index - EP 0933133 A3

EP 0933133 A3 2000-06-21 - Centrifuge and conduit for supplying and/or removing at least one fluid from the separation unit of a centrifuge to a fixed connection site

Title (en)

Centrifuge and conduit for supplying and/or removing at least one fluid from the separation unit of a centrifuge to a fixed connection site

Title (de)

Zentrifuge und Leitung zum Zuführen und/oder Abführen mindestens eines Fluids von der Separationseinheit einer Zentrifuge zu einer ortsfesten Anschlussstelle

Title (fr)

Centrifugeuse et conduite d'alimentation et/ou d'évacuation d'au moins un fluide d'une unité de séparation d'une centrifugeuse vers un site de connexion fixe

Publication

EP 0933133 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99101930 A

Priority

DE 19803534 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0933133A2] A bearing block is fixed to the rotary frame. The bearing block and bushing each have mating, sliding surfaces, which increase in radius such that the bushing receives both radial and axial support. An Independent claim is included for a line (6) supplying and/or taking away fluid from a centrifugal separator, in which a bearing carries and supports the line through the rotating frame. Preferred Features: The bushing is made of softer material than the bearing block. The bearing block is metal, preferably steel. The bushing has a cylindrical section connected to its conical end; both of these sections being matched by bearing block surfaces. The bearing block has a slot along one side to enable the bushing to be introduced. There is a circumferential shoulder at the other end of the bushing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B04B 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B04B 11/00 (2006.01); B04B 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B04B 5/0442 (2013.01); B04B 2005/0492 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0933133 A2 19990804; EP 0933133 A3 20000621; EP 0933133 B1 20020508; DE 19803534 A1 19990812; DE 19803534 C2 19991111; ES 2177149 T3 20021201; JP 4354563 B2 20091028; JP H11262684 A 19990928; US 6273849 B1 20010814

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160201

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160802

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160129

2016-10-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20160930

2016-09-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20160129

2016-08-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59901371

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150119

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150127

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150128

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150126

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130129

2013-09-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59901371

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120112

- Year of fee payment: 14

2003-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030211

2002-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2177149

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-10-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-08-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020801

2002-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59901371

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-06-13

2002-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-09-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010719

2001-02-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000526

2000-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-08-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI