Global Patent Index - EP 0933150 A3

EP 0933150 A3 2000-05-03 - Method for producing a heat exchanger for fuel fired water heaters

Title (en)

Method for producing a heat exchanger for fuel fired water heaters

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Wärmeübertragers für brennstoffbeheizte Wassererhitzer

Title (fr)

Méthode de production d' un échangeur de chaleur pour un chauffe-eau chauffé par combustible

Publication

EP 0933150 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98122043 A

Priority

DE 19803177 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0933150A2] Heat exchanger production comprises the use of a rotating oversized expander tool working at high pressure. The heat exchanger has pipes and lamella, forming gaps for combustion gas passage. The working pressure expanding the pipes (10), especially the pressure between pipe and lamella (12) and the size of the lamella, are chosen, so that with combustion gas temperatures of ca. 1300 degrees C, the lamella foot sections (16) are cooled to below the recrystallization temperature of the lamella material. This guarantees the seat of the lamella on the pipes without soldering. Each pipe is expanded by an oversized rotating tool (20) passing through it.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 53/08; B21D 39/06; F24H 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 37/24 (2006.01); F28F 1/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 39/08 (2013.01); B21C 37/24 (2013.01); F28F 1/24 (2013.01); F28F 2275/125 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0933150 A2 19990804; EP 0933150 A3 20000503; DE 19803177 A1 19990805; DE 19803177 B4 20050303

INPADOC legal status


2002-06-05 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20011201

2001-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010314

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001103

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-08-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI