Global Patent Index - EP 0933151 B1

EP 0933151 B1 2003-06-25 - Mould for producing castings

Title (en)

Mould for producing castings

Title (de)

Giessform und Verfahren zum Herstellen von Gussstücken

Title (fr)

Moule pour la fabrication de pièces coulées

Publication

EP 0933151 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98120098 A

Priority

DE 19803866 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0933151A1] The path followed by molten metal added to the mould runs along the deepest point (34) of the mould cavity (16), in the form of a channel (36) with an opening (42) into the mould cavity at the deepest position of the channel. Molten metal rises up inside the mould, which includes at least one supply line for a pressurised gas used to form a pressure plug. An Independent claim is also included for a metal casting process using this mould.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22C 9/08; B22D 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22C 9/08 (2006.01); B22D 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 15/02 (2013.01); B22C 9/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0933151 A1 19990804; EP 0933151 B1 20030625; AT 243579 T 20030715; DE 19803866 A1 19990805

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161024

2017-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161102

2017-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170503

2017-07-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170630

2017-06-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 243579 T

- Effective date: 20161024

2017-05-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59808810

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151030

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20151028

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151031

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-09-22 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 59808810

- Effective date: 20110723

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-03-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-24 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-12-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031222

2003-09-25 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030925

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59808810 P 20030731

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-06-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030625

2000-04-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000204

1999-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-08-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI