Global Patent Index - EP 0933167 A3

EP 0933167 A3 2000-03-15 - Device for turning and tilting a vice

Title (en)

Device for turning and tilting a vice

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Drehen und Kippen eines Spannstockes

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour tourner et basculer un étau

Publication

EP 0933167 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99250030 A

Priority

DE 29801296 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0933167A2] The vice can be turned and tilted in three superposed planes. A circular rotary plate (3) is mounted in the lower plane on a base plate (1) with upper horizontal support face (1a). The vice has, in the middle plane, a curved transverse tilt bearing (7) in which a tilt member (5) is swivel-mounted about a horizontal transverse axis (6) off-set by 90 degrees to the longitudinal axis (21) of the vice. The vice can be adjusted between a horizontal and vertical position in the direction of the longitudinal axis of the vice. In the upper plane, the upper area of the tilt member is curved and extends in the longitudinal direction (21) of the vice so that the underside of the vice is formed in the curved upper area as a longitudinal tilt bearing with curved area corresponding to the upper area of the tilt member. The upper area of the tilt member and the longitudinal tilt bearing have the same longitudinal axis parallel to the longitudinal axis (21) of the vice so that the vice can be displaced sideways in a swivel movement relative to the longitudinal axis.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 1/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 1/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 1/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29801296 U1 19980514; EP 0933167 A2 19990804; EP 0933167 A3 20000315

INPADOC legal status


2001-08-30 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-07-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20000916

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-08-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI