Global Patent Index - EP 0933168 A3

EP 0933168 A3 2001-05-02 - Clamping device

Title (en)

Clamping device

Title (de)

Spannvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de serrage

Publication

EP 0933168 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99101165 A

Priority

DE 19803513 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0933168A2] The device consists of a semi-shell (1) holding two end position inquiry elements (2). The semi-shell is formed from a head part and a connection part, which are connected via releasable connection elements. It has connection and locking parts (17,21) for the workpiece clamp device head. The connection elements are located on an intermediate part. The semi-shell is fitted into a gap formed by an aperture in the clamp head.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 5/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 5/12 (2006.01); B25B 5/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 5/122 (2013.01); B25B 5/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0933168 A2 19990804; EP 0933168 A3 20010502; DE 19803513 A1 19990805

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-14 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011103

2002-03-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-08-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI