Global patent index - EP 0933169 A3

EP 0933169 A3 2000-11-15 - Fluid driven percussion device

Title (en)

Fluid driven percussion device

Title (de)

Fluidbetriebenes Schlagwerk

Title (fr)

Dispositif de percussion actionné par un fluide

Publication

EP 0933169 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99101293 A

Priority

DE 19804078 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0933169A2] The rammer has a sleeve-shaped working cylinder (2) in an outer housing (4). The impact piston (3) supports itself on the sleeve via several guide sections. The front guide section (2b) facing the tool, and further neighbouring sections up to the section (2a) for the larger piston face (A1), are integral parts of the sleeve. The outer sleeve face (2g) and the outer housing form pressure medium channels (12) for the return stroke of the impact piston. Each channel is of a length to extend from a front connection channel (14) with a return stroke chamber (2e) accommodating the smaller piston face (A2), via a rear connection channel (16). This is temporarily connected to a working stroke chamber (2d) accommodating the larger piston face.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25D 9/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25D 9/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25D 9/20 (2013.01); B25D 2209/005 (2013.01); B25D 2250/375 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0933169 A2 19990804; EP 0933169 A3 20001115; EP 0933169 B1 20020612; AT 218946 T 20020615; DE 19804078 A1 19990805; ES 2177145 T3 20021201

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160121

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160113

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160112

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ATLAS COPCO CONSTRUCTION TOOLS G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040131

2004-01-25 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040125

2004-01-25 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040125

2003-06-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030313

2003-01-23 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030123

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-01-02 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030102

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-12-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECA

- Free Format Text: 20020612 *ATLAS COPCO CONSTRUCTION TOOLS G.M.B.H.:HELENENSTRASSE 149, D-45143 ESSEN

2002-12-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECH

- Free Format Text: 20020612 *ATLAS COPCO CONSTRUCTION TOOLS G.M.B.H.

2002-12-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021230

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-12-18 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021218

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-12-02 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: ATLAS COPCO CONSTRUCTION TOOLS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT1

2002-12-02 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: ATLAS COPCO CONSTRUCTION TOOLS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

2002-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2177145

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-11-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-10-09 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ATLAS COPCO CONSTRUCTION TOOLS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2002-09-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

- Free Format Text: KRUPP BERCO BAUTECHNIK GMBH TRANSFER- ATLAS COPCO CONSTRUCTION TOOLS GMBH

2002-07-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59901686

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-07-18

2002-06-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2002-06-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2002-06-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 218946

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-06-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2002-06-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: PROKOP, HEINZ-JUERGEN, DR.-ING.

2002-06-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SCHAREINA, MARTIN

2002-06-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: GEIMER, MARCUS

2002-06-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: DEIMEL, THOMAS

2002-02-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: PROKOP, HEINZ-JUERGEN, DR.-ING.

2002-02-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SCHAREINA, MARTIN

2002-02-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: GEIMER, MARCUS

2002-02-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: DEIMEL, THOMAS

2001-10-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010827

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2001-07-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010515

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

1999-08-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI