Global Patent Index - EP 0933230 B1

EP 0933230 B1 2000-09-27 - Folder closed on three sides, with an offset opening

Title (en)

Folder closed on three sides, with an offset opening

Title (de)

Auf drei Seiten geschlossener Ordner, mit einer versetzten Oeffnung

Title (fr)

Pochette fermée sur trois côtés à zone d'ouverture décalées

Publication

EP 0933230 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 99490006 A

Priority

FR 9801372 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0933230A1] A wallet (1), made especially from paper, has front and back panels (4,5) and is closed along three edges (6,7,8). The upper edges (16,17) forming the wallet's opening are angled to form two tips (20,20') which are offset relative to one another along the top of the wallet. Each upper edge has a rising section (18,18') at an angle of 3 - 7 degrees, and a falling section (19,19') at 15 - 30 degrees.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42F 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42F 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42F 7/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0933230 A1 19990804; EP 0933230 B1 20000927; DE 69900011 D1 20001102; FR 2774363 A1 19990806; FR 2774363 B1 20000421

INPADOC legal status


2001-11-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2001-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011031

2001-09-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: PCM HABILCLASS

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-03-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010329

2001-03-28 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000927

2001-03-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010228

2000-12-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001228

2000-11-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69900011 20001102

2000-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-09-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000927

2000-09-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000927

2000-09-27 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000927

2000-04-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

1999-12-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991026

1999-09-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990707

1999-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

1999-08-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI