Global Patent Index - EP 0933322 A3

EP 0933322 A3 2000-05-10 - Filament yarn take-up winder

Title (en)

Filament yarn take-up winder

Title (de)

Aufwickelvorrichtung für Filamentgarn

Title (fr)

Bobinoir pour fil continu

Publication

EP 0933322 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98122970 A

Priority

  • JP 1905198 A
  • JP 1905098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0933322A2] A plurality of packages are carried on a single bobbin holder, and package shape and yarn quality are made uniform. In a filament yarn take-up winder in which a plurality of packages Pa SIMILAR Pd are carried on a single bobbin holder, and in which a rotating contact roller 4 applies pressure to the packages while winding is performed, a contact roller 4 is comprised of 4 individually rotatable roller segments 4a SIMILAR 4d, each arranged to correspond to one of the packages Pa SIMILAR Pd. When each roller segment 4a SIMILAR 4d contains a driving DC brushless motor 10a SIMILAR 10d, the tensions of the filament yarns Ya SIMILAR Yd being wound into packages Pa SIMILAR Pd, respectively, are individually detected by tension detecting mechanisms 11a SIMILAR 11d. Each motor 10a SIMILAR 10d is controlled based on the detected tension values. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 54/42; B65H 54/46; B65H 54/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/42 (2006.01); B65H 54/74 (2006.01); B65H 59/38 (2006.01); B65H 59/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/42 (2013.01); B65H 54/74 (2013.01); B65H 59/385 (2013.01); B65H 59/40 (2013.01); B65H 2551/21 (2013.01); B65H 2551/28 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0933322 A2 19990804; EP 0933322 A3 20000510

INPADOC legal status


2002-01-30 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20011204

2001-01-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001214

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000921

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-12-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 6B 65H 54/42 A, 6B 65H 54/46 B, 6B 65H 54/74 B

1999-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

1999-08-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI