Global Patent Index - EP 0933325 B1

EP 0933325 B1 2002-09-25 - Escalator with service brakes

Title (en)

Escalator with service brakes

Title (de)

Fahrtreppe mit Betriebsbremse

Title (fr)

Escalier roulant avec freins de service

Publication

EP 0933325 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98123066 A

Priority

DE 29801097 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0933325A1] The escalator is driven by a motor with a drive belt that moves the loop of steps. A braking system (10) for the escalator is mounted on a shaft inside the drive belt loop and can be urged against the moving steps. A braking system with a series of pivotable pads (12,14,16,18) mounted on a drum or shaft is used and when the brakes are engaged the application of at least one of these pads is delayed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 23/02; B66B 29/00; B66D 5/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 23/02 (2006.01); B66D 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 23/02 (2013.01); B66D 5/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29801097 U1 19980305; AT 224851 T 20021015; EP 0933325 A1 19990804; EP 0933325 B1 20020925; ES 2184189 T3 20030401

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-03 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20050201

2004-12-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041222

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20041124

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-11-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041119

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-12-09 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20031209

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-08-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: INVENTIO AG

- Effective date: 20030624

2003-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2184189 T3

2003-03-26 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020925

2003-03-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-02-12 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: THYSSEN FAHRTREPPEN GMBH

2002-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805682 20021031

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB LI

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224851 T 20021015

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020215

2000-04-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE ES FR GB LI

1999-09-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990802

1999-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB LI

1999-08-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI