Global Patent Index - EP 0933472 A3

EP 0933472 A3 2000-05-10 - Process for operating a calender and calender

Title (en)

Process for operating a calender and calender

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Betrieb eines Kalanders und Kalander

Title (fr)

Procédé de fonctionnement d'une calandre et calandre

Publication

EP 0933472 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99101366 A

Priority

DE 19803323 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0933472A2] For the operation of a calender assembly for processing web materials, and especially paper, at least one center roller in the vertical stack is curved out of the stack plane at least at one roller gap. The reaction forces for this roller are generated by an appropriate adjustment of the drive torque. The difference in the bending is increased in the rollers flanking the working gap, to reduce the pressures at the edges and/or increase the pressure at the center of the web. To relieve the edge zones, a drive takes over the guide roller on transfer of the drive torque, and the drive torques are distributed more evenly while the edge zones are under pressure. For the control of the lateral pressure profile, one parameter is monitored over the web width and, on a deviation from the control, at least part of the correction is effected through an alteration of the drive torque. The drive torques are selected so that the reaction forces of the adjacent rollers and their bending are not at zero and the shear forces in the web are close to zero. The selected torques give a smallest reaction force which is not equal to zero. One of the center rollers, next to an end roller, is bent out of the roller stack on the same side as the end roller. An Independent claim is included for a calender assembly where at least one center roller (6-11) has a degree of slimness 10. A control (28) delivers the drive torques (A5-A12), so that the reaction forces at this roller and its bend out of the center plane of the roller stack is held within the permissible range.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21G 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21G 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21G 1/00 (2013.01); D21G 1/0006 (2013.01); D21G 1/0033 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0933472 A2 19990804; EP 0933472 A3 20000510; EP 0933472 B1 20040331; AT 263277 T 20040415; CA 2260508 A1 19990729; DE 19803323 A1 19990805; DE 19803323 C2 20030605; US 6234075 B1 20010522

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060112

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-09-18 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070801

2007-01-27 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070127

2007-01-26 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070126

2006-01-13 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20060113

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-01-12 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060112

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-01-12 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060112

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-03-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050104

2005-03-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2005-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2004-09-29 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-06-29 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-05-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908983 P 20040506

2004-03-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR GB SE

2004-03-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040331

2002-05-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020326

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FI FR GB SE

2000-12-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-06-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000412

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI FR GB SE

1999-08-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI