Global Patent Index - EP 0933473 A3

EP 0933473 A3 2000-12-06 - Twin-wire former

Title (en)

Twin-wire former

Title (de)

Doppelsieb-Former

Title (fr)

Formeur a deux toiles

Publication

EP 0933473 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98121729 A

Priority

DE 19803591 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0933473A2] The double fourdrinier assembly, at a papermaking or cardboard prodn. machine to produce a fiber web, has a sharply angled downwards path for the double fourdriniers directly after the web forming roller (30) to develop a web from the pulp flow. The downwards fourdrinier path is at an angle (a) to the theoretical vertical of 10-50 degrees and pref. 45 degrees . A deflection unit (42) moves the path of both fourdriniers (11,12) for the downwards and angled alignment into the horizontal or a slight incline. The angle of the fourdrinier path round the web forming roller (30) can be varied by a swing movement at the stock inlet and the breast roller for the upper fourdrinier (12) round the rotary axis of the roller (30). A curved shoe structure (36), for the web development, lies at the upper fourdrinier (12) on its downwards path, opposite at least one deflector at the lower fourdrinier (11) or pliable bar (38) pressed against it. At least one pliable bar is pressed against the upper fourdrinier (12) at the circumference of the web development roller (30). An equal pressure water extraction stage is at the angled downwards path of the fourdriniers, with a static section against one fourdrinier (12) while the other section is pressed against the other fourdrinier (11) at an adjustable pressure, using plates or plate segments in both sections. The water extraction unit is permeable to liquid, and pref. perforated. In another form, the two fourdriniers (11,12) within the double fourdrinier zone are only in contact with static water extraction units (36,37) apart from the roller (30). A suction unit is at the lower fourdrinier (11) at the fourdrinier separation point on the downwards path. After separation, the lower fourdrinier (11) continues on an angled and downwards path, and pref. over a further water extraction unit, and the web is picked off (8,9) from the lower fourdrinier (11). At the end of the downwards fourdrinier path, the two fourdriniers (11,12) pass round a suction roller within the loop of the upper fourdrinier (12), and a lower suction system separates the lower fourdrinier (11) and the web from the upper fourdrinier (12). The double fourdrinier can be free of web forming bars. Directly after the web development roller (30), a pref. perforated guide plate with a convex curvature can be at the upper fourdrinier (12).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 9/02 (2006.01); D21F 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 9/003 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0933473 A2 19990804; EP 0933473 A3 20001206; EP 0933473 B1 20040616; AT 269439 T 20040715; CA 2260511 A1 19990730; CA 2260511 C 20080108; DE 19803591 A1 19990805; JP 4301619 B2 20090722; JP H11269793 A 19991005; US 6267846 B1 20010731

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151114

2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160601

2016-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151114

2016-07-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 269439 T

- Effective date: 20151114

2016-06-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59811574

2015-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20141120

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141119

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-01-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20141112

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121114

2013-07-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121115

2012-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20111128

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101122

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-06-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050317

2004-08-24 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-07-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59811574 P 20040722

2004-06-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI IT SE

2003-04-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030224

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FI IT SE

2001-08-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010606

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7D 21F 9/00 A

1999-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI IT SE

1999-08-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI