Global patent index - EP 0933480 A3

EP 0933480 A3 2000-01-26 - Flushing cistern

Title (en)

Flushing cistern

Title (de)

Spülkasten

Title (fr)

Réservoir de chasse d'eau

Publication

EP 0933480 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99810019 A

Priority

CH 21098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0933480A2] The recesses are grooves (19) in which, fasteners (3) are pushed in the longitudinal direction. The grooves are open towards the front side (2a) or rear side (2b) of the cistern (2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03D 1/012

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03D 1/012 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03D 1/0125 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29822709 U1 19990311; EP 0933480 A2 19990804; EP 0933480 A3 20000126; PL 330618 A1 19990802

INPADOC legal status

2005-02-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040817

2003-05-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030325

2000-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: AT BE DE ES FR IT NL

2000-10-04 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 20000318

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000318

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR IT NL

1999-08-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI