Global Patent Index - EP 0933481 A3

EP 0933481 A3 2000-02-23 - Device for the fixation of an actuating means on an in-wall cistern

Title (en)

Device for the fixation of an actuating means on an in-wall cistern

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Befestigung eines Betätigungsorgans an einem Unterputzspülkasten

Title (fr)

Dispositif de fixation d'un déclencheur à un réservoir de chasse d'eau

Publication

EP 0933481 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99810020 A

Priority

CH 21198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0933481A2] The connection between the spacing bolt (1) and the holding element (6) is formed as tipping connection. The spacing bolt is inclined to the axis of opening (20) and is pushed into the opening. The opening has two radially outward slots (10a,b) which are spaced from each other, and are diagonally located.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03D 1/012

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E03D 1/012 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E03D 5/028 (2013.01); E03D 1/012 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29822703 U1 19990415; AT 253150 T 20031115; DE 59907488 D1 20031204; EP 0933481 A2 19990804; EP 0933481 A3 20000223; EP 0933481 B1 20031029; ES 2211017 T3 20040701; PL 330617 A1 19990802

INPADOC legal status


2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *PROSAN D.O.O.

- Effective date: 20050131

2006-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050115

2005-12-31 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20051102

2005-11-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-10-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050801

2005-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-08-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050802

2005-08-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050801

2005-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *PROSAN D.O.O.

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-15 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050115

2005-01-14 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050114

2005-01-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050114

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2004-10-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040730

2004-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2211017 T3

2004-06-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-01-15 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040115

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-01-07 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040107

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-12-15 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20031215

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-12-12 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031212

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-12-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031208

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-12-04 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20031204

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-12-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59907488 P 20031204

2003-10-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR IT NL

2003-10-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: SI

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE DE ES FR IT NL

2000-11-02 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20000318

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000318

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR IT NL

1999-08-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI