Global patent index - EP 0933482 A3

EP 0933482 A3 2000-05-10 - Prefabricated element for cantilevered balcony slab

Title (en)

Prefabricated element for cantilevered balcony slab

Title (de)

Fertigbauteil für eine auskragende Balkonplatte

Title (fr)

Elément préfabriqué pour dalle de balcon en porte-à-faux

Publication

EP 0933482 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98122818 A

Priority

DE 29801308 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0933482A2] The unit has insulation prefabricated insulation bodies (1) having slots spaced along their length for receiving tension rods. A recess is provided in the lower region of the insulation bodies, which passes straight through, and a compression zone is formed from a concrete mixture with relatively low insulating properties and a high compressive strength, which is poured into the recess.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/00; E04B 1/76

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/0038 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29801308 U1 19980430; AT 266778 T 20040515; EP 0933482 A2 19990804; EP 0933482 A3 20000510; EP 0933482 B1 20040512

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160407

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59811382

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE BERNHARDT/WOLFF PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: KKI ENTERPRISES GMBH, CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PUE

2006-08-31 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: AEN

- Free Format Text: DAS PATENT IST AUFGRUND DES WEITERBEHANDLUNGSANTRAGS VOM 09.08.2006 REAKTIVIERT WORDEN.

2006-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2005-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051231

2005-09-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: BRAUNPAT BRAUN EDER AG

2005-09-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: AEN

- Free Format Text: DAS PATENT IST AUFGRUND DES WEITERBEHANDLUNGSANTRAGS VOM 16.08.2005 REAKTIVIERT WORDEN.

2005-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2005-05-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050215

2004-12-01 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-06-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59811382

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-06-17

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-05-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-05-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030214

2001-01-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE LI

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001028

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ORTH, WILHELM, DIPL.-ING.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-01-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KAHMER, HERBERT H., DR.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

1999-08-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI