Global Patent Index - EP 0933484 A3

EP 0933484 A3 2000-05-03 - Connection fitting

Title (en)

Connection fitting

Title (de)

Verbindungsbeschlag

Title (fr)

Ferrure d'assemblage

Publication

EP 0933484 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99890020 A

Priority

AT 13098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0933484A2] The connector has a connecting shackle (2) with two ribbed metal rod sections (21) set side by side and welded together with mutual spacing by using at least two perforated plates (22). The metal rod sections form a curved end section (23) at one end. The perforated plates each have one larger hole for screwing in a fastening screw and one smaller hole (7) for hammering in a fixing pin.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01F 15/04 (2006.01); E04B 1/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01F 15/0453 (2013.01); E04B 1/2604 (2013.01); E04B 2001/2644 (2013.01); E04B 2001/2668 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0933484 A2 19990804; EP 0933484 A3 20000503; AT 405865 B 19991227; AT A13098 A 19990415

INPADOC legal status


2002-02-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010801

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI PT SE

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000921

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI PT SE

1999-08-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI