Global Patent Index - EP 0933488 A3

EP 0933488 A3 2000-11-08 - Ceiling grid for clean rooms

Title (en)

Ceiling grid for clean rooms

Title (de)

Deckenraster für Reinräume

Title (fr)

Grille de plafond pour salles blanches

Publication

EP 0933488 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99101371 A

Priority

DE 19803080 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0933488A2] The frame members (1) are joined at their ends by matching corner pieces (2) in a butt joint held together with bolts (21). The joint face (22) has a groove (31) into which a slightly protruding sealing strip is fitted. The strip is shaped to follow the outline of the section and is compressed as the bolts are tightened.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 9/02; E04B 9/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 9/02 (2006.01); E04B 9/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 9/064 (2013.01); E04B 9/02 (2013.01); E04B 9/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19803080 A1 19990729; EP 0933488 A2 19990804; EP 0933488 A3 20001108; US 6158186 A 20001212

INPADOC legal status


2002-03-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010509

2001-07-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: FELLER, EUGEN

1999-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI NL

1999-08-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI