Global Patent Index - EP 0933494 A3

EP 0933494 A3 2000-04-19 - Device for storing umbrella-type clothes dryers against buildings

Title (en)

Device for storing umbrella-type clothes dryers against buildings

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Aufbewahrung von Wäscheschirmen an Bauwerken

Title (fr)

Dispositif de rangement le long de bâtiments de séchoirs à linge du type parapluie

Publication

EP 0933494 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99810057 A

Priority

CH 23798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0933494A2] The device is fastened to a building (0) via holes in the (4) base plate (1) and secured by means of screws (3) and dowels (2). A rectangular piece of tube (5), inclined on one side, is fastened on the plate (1) and connected to a guide part (7). The guide part (7) carries a wire strap (8) on its bottom part for fixing the laundry screen tube.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 12/22; D06F 57/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 57/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 57/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0933494 A2 19990804; EP 0933494 A3 20000419; EP 0933494 B1 20031015; AT 252188 T 20031115; CH 692746 A5 20021015; DE 59907326 D1 20031120

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2004-10-22 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-10-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040716

2004-08-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040803

2004-06-04 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040604

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-01-26 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040126

2003-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59907326 P 20031120

2003-10-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2003-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-10-15 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031015

2003-10-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031015

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR IT LI

2000-10-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000825

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

1999-08-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI