Global Patent Index - EP 0933507 B1

EP 0933507 B1 2002-09-25 - Device for crankcase ventilation for an internal combusion engine

Title (en)

Device for crankcase ventilation for an internal combusion engine

Title (de)

Entlüftungsvorrichtung für ein Kurbelgehäuse einer Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif de ventilation de carter d'un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0933507 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98123975 A

Priority

DE 19803872 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0933507A1] The device has a centrifugal oil separator (3) with ring-shaped intake channel (6), which extends radially offset and mainly axis-parallel to the rotary axis (5) of the separator. The outer wall (8) of the channel is also part of the separator housing wall (4) . The outer channel wall has oil outlet bores (9). A cover (12) for the housing is fastened to the crankcase (2), forming a feed channel (13), which communicates with the intake channel. The housing is non-turnably connected to the differential shaft (14).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01M 13/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01M 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01M 13/04 (2013.01); F01M 2013/0422 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0933507 A1 19990804; EP 0933507 B1 20020925; DE 19803872 A1 19990805; DE 19803872 C2 20010510; US 5954035 A 19990921

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150701

2015-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59805683

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140228

- Year of fee payment: 16

2005-12-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051217

2005-10-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2005-08-10 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041217

2004-12-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041217

2003-12-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031209

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-11-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20031126

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-04-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021128

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805683 20021031

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010612

2000-04-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

1999-09-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990703

1999-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-08-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI