Global patent index - EP 0933509 B1

EP 0933509 B1 2001-03-28 - Exhaust manifold

Title (en)

Exhaust manifold

Title (de)

Abgaskrümmer

Title (fr)

Collecteur d'échappement

Publication

EP 0933509 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98118632 A

Priority

DE 19803275 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0933509A1] The exhaust manifold has sliding seat sockets (15,16), which are formed by internal high pressure forming of the outer radius (Ra) of a tube bend (17,18). Socket and/or pipe connections (10,13) have sloping ends. The ratio between socket length and tube bend diameter is approx. 0,5. The socket of one T-section (5) engages over the pipe connection (10) of the end section (4), and the socket (16) of the other T-section (6) engages over the pipe connection (13) of the first T-section.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01N 7/10; F01N 7/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01N 13/10 (2010.01); F01N 13/18 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 13/10 (2013.01); F01N 13/1883 (2013.01); F01N 2260/10 (2013.01); F01N 2470/24 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

DE 19514020 A1 19961017 - DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0933509 A1 19990804; EP 0933509 B1 20010328; EP 0933509 B2 20050216; BR 9804289 A 19991221; CZ 294172 B6 20041013; CZ 9803223 A3 19990811; DE 19803275 A1 19990812; ES 2159417 T3 20011001; ES 2159417 T5 20050901; PT 933509 E 20010731; US 6134886 A 20001024

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151028

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151023

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151028

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151027

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150917

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2006-02-24 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET3

2005-09-01 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Ref Legal Event Code: DC2A

2005-05-31 [REG SE RPEO] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN MODIFIED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: RPEO

2005-04-13 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBTA

- Effective date: 20050323

2005-02-16 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20050216

2005-02-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

2002-03-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: FRIEDRICH BOYSEN GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20011221

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2159417

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-08-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-07-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20010329

2001-06-25 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59800573

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-03

2001-04-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

2000-09-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000808

2000-04-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

1999-08-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990507

1999-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

1999-08-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI