Global Patent Index - EP 0933527 A3

EP 0933527 A3 2001-12-05 - Fluid actuated rotary drive mechanism

Title (en)

Fluid actuated rotary drive mechanism

Title (de)

Fluidbetätigte Drehantriebsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'entraînement rotatif actionné par fluide

Publication

EP 0933527 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98123579 A

Priority

DE 19803819 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0933527A2] Engaged with the toothed rim (34) are two adjacently located drive pistons (12,12') which have toothed rod-type teeth (13,13'). The drive pistons through fluid operation are movable in parallel directions opposite to one another, in order to provoke a rotary movement (26) of the driven part between two end positions. A position indication device (3), by working in conjunction with the two drive pistons, makes possible the indication of an intermediate position between the end positions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F03C 1/02; F15B 15/08; F16H 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/06 (2006.01); F03C 1/02 (2006.01); F15B 11/12 (2006.01); F15B 15/08 (2006.01); F15B 15/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/065 (2013.01); F03C 1/02 (2013.01); F15B 11/123 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0933527 A2 19990804; EP 0933527 A3 20011205; EP 0933527 B1 20040204; DE 19803819 A1 19990812; DE 19803819 B4 20040513; JP 3122423 B2 20010109; JP H11270508 A 19991005; US 6170384 B1 20010109

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161210

2017-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170102

2017-10-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161210

2017-09-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170831

2017-08-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20161210

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161117

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151218

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151116

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071210

2006-12-07 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20061207

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-01-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041105

2004-11-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-09-22 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-03-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59810712 P 20040311

2004-03-10 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-02-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040204

2004-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB IT

2004-02-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021205

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI FR GB IT

2002-01-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011121

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB IT

1999-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-08-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI