Global Patent Index - EP 0933529 A3

EP 0933529 A3 2000-06-07 - Internal gear pump with empty crescent space

Title (en)

Internal gear pump with empty crescent space

Title (de)

Sichellose Innenzahnradpumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe à engrenages internes sans croissant

Publication

EP 0933529 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98120950 A

Priority

DE 19804133 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0933529A2] The hollow wheel (1) has radial breakthroughs (1.1), which produce a conductive connection between the tooth base and the cover surface of the hollow wheel. Between the supporting flanks of the teeth (1.3) of the hollow wheel or the teeth (2.2) of the pinion and the radial holes of the hollow wheel conductive connections are produced. The conductive connections consist of grooves, which extend over a part of the length of the flanks, or over the complete flank length of the teeth. Several grooves are provided in each flank axially next to one another.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 2/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04C 2/08 (2006.01); F04C 2/10 (2006.01); F04C 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 2/102 (2013.01); F04C 2/084 (2013.01); F04C 15/0007 (2013.01); Y10T 74/19972 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0933529 A2 19990804; EP 0933529 A3 20000607; DE 19804133 A1 19990812; JP H11257246 A 19990921; KR 19990072376 A 19990927; US 6164943 A 20001226

INPADOC legal status


2007-10-31 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070926

2007-08-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030711

2003-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030711

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001114

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE

1999-08-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI