Global Patent Index - EP 0933591 A3

EP 0933591 A3 2001-03-14 - Halogen lamp

Title (en)

Halogen lamp

Title (de)

Halogenleuchte

Title (fr)

Lampe à halogène

Publication

EP 0933591 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99101252 A

Priority

DE 19803882 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0933591A2] the halogen light has a housing with a light outlet opening and a halogen lamp axially movable in the housing, loaded towards the light outlet opening by a spring and pushed back by a removable clamp ring opposing the spring. When the ring is removed the spring forces the lamp forwards to a protruding position. A lamp holder is attached to a yoke (32) mounted to slide axially on two journals (38). At least one journal is enclosed by a coil spring (42) clamped between a rear housing stop (40) and the rear of the yoke. The forward position of the lamp is defined by at least one stop (44)

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 19/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 17/12 (2006.01); F21V 17/14 (2006.01); F21V 19/00 (2006.01); F21V 19/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 19/04 (2013.01); F21V 17/12 (2013.01); F21V 17/14 (2013.01); F21V 19/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0933591 A2 19990804; EP 0933591 A3 20010314; EP 0933591 B1 20060621; AT 331185 T 20060715; DE 19803882 A1 19990812; DE 19803882 B4 20040212; DE 59913568 D1 20060803; SG 71191 A1 20000321; US 6183113 B1 20010206

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170125

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170125

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20170124

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170124

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170120

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170125

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170124

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170125

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161227

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170124

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2007-05-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070322

2006-12-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-10-17 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-10-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060918

2006-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2006-08-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59913568 P 20060803

2006-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-06-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2006-06-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-06-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060621

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010410

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

1999-08-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI