Global patent index - EP 0933593 A3

EP 0933593 A3 2000-01-19 - Dual fuel burner

Title (en)

Dual fuel burner

Title (de)

Zweistoffbrenner

Title (fr)

Brûleur à deux combustibles

Publication

EP 0933593 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98123875 A

Priority

DE 19803879 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0933593A2] The burner (1) is also capable of running on gaseous fuel (G) supplied via a channel (7) between the prim. and sec. supply channels (5, 6) for combustion air (L1, L2). The gaseous fuel supply channel leads into the inside of the atomising nozzle lip (3), opening out into the prim. and/or sec. air supply channel upstream from the nozzle edge (4) forming the rear end of the lip. The atomising nozzle (2) generates a spray cone (13) formed when the liquid fuel (F) impinges against a nozzle lip with a concentric arrangement relative to the nozzle central axis (X). The prim. air supply channel leading to the spray cone passes through the inside of the nozzle lip, whilst the sec. air supply channel extends over the outside of the lip, combining with the prim. air supply channel to form an enveloping flow of air.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23D 11/10; F23D 11/24; F23D 17/00; F23R 3/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23D 11/00 (2006.01); F23D 11/10 (2006.01); F23D 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 11/007 (2013.01); F23D 11/107 (2013.01); F23D 17/002 (2013.01); F23D 2900/11101 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0933593 A2 19990804; EP 0933593 A3 20000119; EP 0933593 B1 20030514; DE 19803879 C1 19990826; JP H11248114 A 19990914; US 6068470 A 20000530

INPADOC legal status

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141216

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-09-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20150831

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131216

2014-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131216

2014-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131213

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131218

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121220

- Year of fee payment: 15

2004-05-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040217

2004-01-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-09-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-08-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030825

2003-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

2003-05-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-03-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: MTU AERO ENGINES GMBH

2000-09-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: ES FR GB IT

2000-03-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991214

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: 7F 23D 11/10 A, 7F 23D 11/24 B, 7F 23D 17/00 B, 7F 23R 3/36 B

1999-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT

1999-08-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI