Global patent index - EP 0933595 A3

EP 0933595 A3 2000-02-09 - Method for reducing nitrons fumes in combustion facilities with simultaneous saving of energy

Title (en)

Method for reducing nitrons fumes in combustion facilities with simultaneous saving of energy

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Verminderung nitroser Gase in Verbrennungsanlagen unter gleichzeitiger Energieeinsparung

Title (fr)

Procédé pour diminuer les gaz nitreux dans des installations de combustion tout en économisant de l'énergie

Publication

EP 0933595 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98120236 A

Priority

DE 19748189 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19748189A1] The method reduces the amount of nitrous gas such as nitrous oxide when operating a combustion system. Compared with the amount of air required for complete combustion, the burner is operated partly with excess and partly with insufficient air. The difference between the amounts of air can be between 20 % and 40 %, and the overall surplus of air can be between 15 % and 50 % of that required for complete combustion. Natural gas, combustible exhaust gases, heating oil, pulverized coal or combustible waste from chemical production can be used as the heating agent.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23N 1/00; F23C 7/00; F23N 3/00; F23N 5/00; F23N 5/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23C 6/04 (2006.01); F23G 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23G 7/00 (2013.01); F23C 6/045 (2013.01); F23C 2201/101 (2013.01); F23J 2215/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19748189 A1 19990520; EP 0933595 A2 19990804; EP 0933595 A3 20000209

INPADOC legal status

2002-04-24 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20020223

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000809

2000-10-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE ES FR IT LI

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 23N 1/00 A, 7F 23N 3/00 B, 7F 23N 5/00 B, 7F 23N 5/24 B, 7F 23C 7/00 B

1999-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR IT LI

1999-08-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI