Global Patent Index - EP 0933787 A3

EP 0933787 A3 2000-11-02 - Column-shaped electrical insulator

Title (en)

Column-shaped electrical insulator

Title (de)

Säulenförmiger elektrischer Isolator

Title (fr)

Isolateur électrique sous forme de colonne

Publication

EP 0933787 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99810084 A

Priority

CH 25398 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0933787A2] The insulator has an essentially tubular base body (11) of electrically insulating material, esp. fibreglass-reinforced plastic and at least one socket (12) mounted on the end of the base body. The socket is attached with a number of attachment devices (15,16) which penetrate the base body and has a holder part with a section in contact with the inside of the base body. Independent claims are also included for a method of manufacturing an insulator and for an application to carry a voltage cable, such as high voltage cable.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01B 17/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01B 17/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01B 17/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[XA] CH 379592 A 19640715 - SIEMENS AG [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0933787 A2 19990804; EP 0933787 A3 20001102

INPADOC legal status


2002-06-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-05-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010503

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-08-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI