Global Patent Index - EP 0933789 A3

EP 0933789 A3 2000-05-17 - Planar transformer

Title (en)

Planar transformer

Title (de)

Flachtransformator

Title (fr)

Transformateur plan

Publication

EP 0933789 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99101400 A

Priority

IT GE980003 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0933789A2] Planar transformer equipped with means (7, 8, 9) for the extension of the air path of a hypothetical electric spark caused by the irregular working of the planar transformer. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 27/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/28 (2006.01); H01F 27/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/2804 (2013.01); H01F 27/324 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0933789 A2 19990804; EP 0933789 A3 20000517; IT 1304341 B1 20010315; IT GE980003 A1 19990730; IT GE980003 D0 19980130

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020104

2001-10-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010824

2001-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001025

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-08-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI