Global patent index - EP 0933807 A3

EP 0933807 A3 2000-01-26 - Method for manufacturing a power semiconductor device

Title (en)

Method for manufacturing a power semiconductor device

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Leistungshalbleiterbauelementes

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'un dispositif semi-conducteur de puissance

Publication

EP 0933807 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98124404 A

Priority

DE 19804192 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0933807A2] The method involves one step of forming a structure with doped regions (2) on each surface of two substrates (1) of electrically conductive doped semiconductor material. In the second step the substrates are thinned from an opposing surface. In the third step these surfaces are permanently and electrically conductively connected together. The third step may be carried out using wafer bonding. The third step is preferably carried out at temperatures less than 350 deg. C. In the first step structures of one or more IGBTs or one or more GTO thyristors may be formed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 21/331; H01L 21/332

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01L 29/74 (2006.01); H01L 21/20 (2006.01); H01L 21/301 (2006.01); H01L 21/331 (2006.01); H01L 21/332 (2006.01); H01L 21/336 (2006.01); H01L 21/60 (2006.01); H01L 29/739 (2006.01); H01L 29/749 (2006.01); H01L 29/78 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01L 24/80 (2013.01); H01L 21/2007 (2013.01); H01L 29/66333 (2013.01); H01L 29/66348 (2013.01); H01L 29/66363 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01004 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01005 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01006 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01013 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01023 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01033 (2013.01); H01L 2924/01075 (2013.01); H01L 2924/12036 (2013.01); H01L 2924/1301 (2013.01); H01L 2924/1305 (2013.01); H01L 2924/13055 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. H01L 2924/1301 + H01L 2924/00
  2. H01L 2924/1305 + H01L 2924/00
  3. H01L 2924/12036 + H01L 2924/00

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0933807 A2 19990804; EP 0933807 A3 20000126; EP 0933807 B1 20060614; DE 19804192 A1 19990812; DE 59813599 D1 20060727; JP 3848479 B2 20061122; JP H11340246 A 19991210; US 6066542 A 20000523

INPADOC legal status

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160204

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150217

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060614

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070309

2007-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2007-05-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070315

2007-05-04 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2007-01-10 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20060614

2006-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061231

2006-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061231

2006-09-14 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060914

2006-07-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59813599

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20060727

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-06-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2006-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2006-06-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060614

2006-06-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060614

2006-06-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG

2000-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

1999-08-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI