Global patent index - EP 0933836 A3

EP 0933836 A3 2000-03-22 - Connector with coupling assist mechanism

Title (en)

Connector with coupling assist mechanism

Title (de)

Verbinder mit Kupplungshilfsmechanismus

Title (fr)

Connecteur avec mécanisme pour assister le couplage

Publication

EP 0933836 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99100587 A

Priority

  • EP 99100587 A
  • EP 98400205 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0933836A2] A connector (2) has a camming slide (26) slidably mounted on a connector housing (4). The camming slide has a lever arm (50) with pinion (48) engaging a toothed rack (58) provided on the housing (4). Particularly low forces are required by an operator for mating connectors. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/629

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/629 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/62905 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0933836 A2 19990804; EP 0933836 A3 20000322; EP 0933836 B1 20050323

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160126

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2006-03-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20051227

2006-03-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-04-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69924311

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-04-28

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-03-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-03-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-10-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: JODON DE VILLEROCHE, FRANEOIS

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000921

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-08-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI