Global Patent Index - EP 0933839 A3

EP 0933839 A3 2000-05-17 - Safety bulb holder

Title (en)

Safety bulb holder

Title (de)

Sicherheitsfassung

Title (fr)

Douille d'ampoule de sécurité

Publication

EP 0933839 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99300125 A

Priority

GB 9801682 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0933839A2] There is disclosed a bayonet-fitting bulb holder having a socket and a cover plate therein for the contact pins which has apertures for the pins and which is moved by the action of inserting a bulb so as to align the apertures with the pins and by the action of removing a bulb so as to cover the pins and comprising a locking arrangement preventing movement of the cover plate from the pin-covering position except by inserting a bulb or like member filling the socket. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 33/965

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/453 (2006.01); H01R 33/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/4532 (2013.01); H01R 33/46 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0933839 A2 19990804; EP 0933839 A3 20000517; GB 9801682 D0 19980325

INPADOC legal status


2001-08-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20001118

2001-03-01 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01R 33/965 A

1999-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-08-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI