Global Patent Index - EP 0933973 B1

EP 0933973 B1 2003-06-25 - Method of manipulating an operating light

Title (en)

Method of manipulating an operating light

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Manipulieren einer Operationsleuchte

Title (fr)

Méthode de manipulation d'une lampe d'opération chirurgicale

Publication

EP 0933973 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98121961 A

Priority

DE 19803494 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0933973A2] Control signals are led through a path forming part of the lamp interior, between an operating unit and an actuator. The control signals are modulated onto a carrier and are subsequently demodulated.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 37/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21S 8/00 (2006.01); H04L 25/28 (2006.01); H05B 37/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 37/02 (2013.01); F21V 21/403 (2013.01); F21W 2131/205 (2013.01); Y10S 362/804 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0933973 A2 19990804; EP 0933973 A3 20010523; EP 0933973 B1 20030625; DE 19803494 A1 19990805; US 6160582 A 20001212

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090603

2009-09-11 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090731

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081119

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080131

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071122

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071124

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-02-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-09-25 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030925

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59808811 P 20030731

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT SE

2003-01-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BERCHTOLD HOLDING GMBH

2002-09-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020730

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT SE

2001-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010904

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT SE

1999-08-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI