Global patent index - EP 0933977 A3

EP 0933977 A3 2001-01-10 - Device for igniting and operating a high pressure discharge lamp in a vehicle

Title (en)

Device for igniting and operating a high pressure discharge lamp in a vehicle

Title (de)

Einrichtung zum Zünden und Betreiben einer Hochdruckgasentladungslampe in einem Kraftfahrzeug

Title (fr)

Dispositif d' amorçage et d' alimentation d' une lampe à décharge à haute pression dans un véhicule

Publication

EP 0933977 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99101909 A

Priority

DE 19803855 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0933977A2] The starter unit includes two ignition transformers (ZT1, ZT2). Their secondary windings are connected in conductors between the running control circuit and the high pressure gas discharge lamp (GEL).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 41/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/042 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0933977 A2 19990804; EP 0933977 A3 20010110; DE 19803855 A1 19990805

INPADOC legal status

2002-12-11 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20020628

2002-03-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020212

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE ES FR GB IT

2001-06-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010420

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

1999-08-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI