Global patent index - EP 0934012 B1

EP 0934012 B1 2000-12-13 - METHOD FOR TREATING BIVALVULAR SHELL-FISH TO FACILITATE THEIR OPENING

Title (en)

METHOD FOR TREATING BIVALVULAR SHELL-FISH TO FACILITATE THEIR OPENING

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR ERLEICHTERUNG DES ÖFFNENS VON ZWEISCHALIGEN SCHALENTIEREN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DES COQUILLAGES BI-VALVES DESTINE A FACILITER LEUR OUVERTURE

Publication

EP 0934012 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97911294 A

Priority

  • FR 9701869 W
  • FR 9612885 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2754694A1] The invention concerns a method for treating oysters to facilitate their opening, whereby a hole (7) is made in the top (1) shell of the oyster near the adducent muscle (3). An open bearing (8) whose internal diameter is adapted to the diameter of the opening knife (9) is placed in this hole (7).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47G 21/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47G 21/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47G 21/068 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE ES FR IT LU NL PT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2754694 A1 19980424; FR 2754694 B1 19981231; EP 0934012 A1 19990811; EP 0934012 B1 20001213; ES 2154895 T3 20010416; PT 934012 E 20010430; WO 9817158 A1 19980430

INPADOC legal status

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *OSTRAQUICK S.A.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20051031

2007-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20051021

2006-10-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-07-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20060501

2006-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060501

2005-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-21 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051021

2005-10-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051020

2005-07-22 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

2005-07-22 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2004-11-23 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041123

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-11-12 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041112

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-11-04 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041104

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041031

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-10-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20041029

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-07-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-04-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2002-10-09 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021009

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-12-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-04-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20010205

2001-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2154895

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-03-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DRAGOTTI & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE ES FR IT LU NL PT

2000-03-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000210

1999-08-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990415

1999-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE ES FR IT LU NL PT