Global Patent Index - EP 0934060 A4

EP 0934060 A4 2001-01-03 - DIETARY SUPPLEMENTS

Title (en)

DIETARY SUPPLEMENTS

Title (de)

NAHRUNGSZUSÄTZE

Title (fr)

COMPLEMENTS ALIMENTAIRES

Publication

EP 0934060 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97936955 A

Priority

  • US 9711932 W
  • US 68844896 A
  • US 68844596 A
  • US 81577997 A
  • US 87379297 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9804248A1] The present invention relates to dietary supplements for supplementing the dietary needs of women and preventing or reducing life stage associated health risks during each of their principal adult life stages (pre-perimenopause, perimenopause and menopause, or post-menopause). It also relates to a method of supplementing the dietary needs of women whereby an effective amount of a life stage appropriate dietary supplement is administered to a woman at each of her life stages throughout her life. The present also relates to dietary supplements for supplementing the specific phytochemical dietary needs of perimenopausal and menopausal women which contain low doses of phytoestrogens, and a method for such dietary supplementation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/07; A23L 1/30; A23L 1/302; A23L 1/304; A23L 1/305; A61K 31/19; A61K 31/28; A61K 31/30; A61K 31/34; A61K 31/35; A61K 31/44; A61K 31/56; A61K 31/59; A61K 31/69; A61K 35/78

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A23L 1/302 (2006.01); A23L 1/304 (2006.01); A61K 9/06 (2006.01); A61K 9/08 (2006.01); A61K 9/14 (2006.01); A61K 9/20 (2006.01); A61K 9/48 (2006.01); A61K 31/07 (2006.01); A61K 31/19 (2006.01); A61K 31/28 (2006.01); A61K 31/295 (2006.01); A61K 31/30 (2006.01); A61K 31/315 (2006.01); A61K 31/34 (2006.01); A61K 31/35 (2006.01); A61K 31/435 (2006.01); A61K 31/44 (2006.01); A61K 31/445 (2006.01); A61K 31/495 (2006.01); A61K 31/56 (2006.01); A61K 31/59 (2006.01); A61K 31/69 (2006.01); A61K 33/06 (2006.01); A61K 33/08 (2006.01); A61K 33/10 (2006.01); A61K 33/22 (2006.01); A61K 33/24 (2006.01); A61K 33/26 (2006.01); A61K 33/32 (2006.01); A61K 33/34 (2006.01); A61K 36/00 (2006.01); A61P 3/02 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 33/32 (2013.01); A23V 2002/00 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. A61K 33/32 + A61K 33/30 + A61K 33/26 + A61K 33/24 + A61K 33/22 + A61K 33/06 + A61K 31/59 + A61K 31/505 + A61K 31/714 + A61K 31/44 + A61K 31/355 + A61K 31/375
  2. A61K 33/32 + A61K 2300/00
  3. A23V 2002/00 + A23V 2250/156 + A23V 2250/1586 + A23V 2250/71 + A23V 2250/704 + A23V 2250/712 + A23V 2250/708 + A23V 2250/2116
  4. A23V 2002/00 + A23V 2250/1578 + A23V 2250/161 + A23V 2250/1572 + A23V 2250/1588 + A23V 2250/1612 + A23V 2250/1642 + A23V 2250/1592 + A23V 2250/156

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9804248 A1 19980205; AU 3958797 A 19980220; AU 718218 B2 20000413; CA 2261764 A1 19980205; EP 0934060 A1 19990811; EP 0934060 A4 20010103; JP 2002514170 A 20020514

INPADOC legal status


2006-02-17 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1021621

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2003-09-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030304

2002-10-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020822

2001-01-03 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20001117

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 61K 31/07 A, 7A 61K 31/19 B, 7A 61K 31/28 B, 7A 61K 31/30 B, 7A 61K 31/34 B, 7A 61K 31/35 B, 7A 61K 31/44 B, 7A 61K 31/56 B, 7A 61K 31/59 B, 7A 61K 31/69 B, 7A 23L 1/302 B, 7A 23L 1/304 B, 7A 23L 1/305 B, 7A 61K 35/78 B, 7A 23L 1/30 B

1999-08-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990226

1999-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE