Global Patent Index - EP 0934107 B1

EP 0934107 B1 2000-12-13 - SCENTED ROOM WITH AN AIRFLOW WITH VARYING FRAGRANCES

Title (en)

SCENTED ROOM WITH AN AIRFLOW WITH VARYING FRAGRANCES

Title (de)

DUFTRAUM MIT EINER LUFTSTRÖMUNG MIT WECHSELNDEN DÜFTEN

Title (fr)

ESPACE PARFUME AVEC COURANT D'AIR A PARFUMS VARIABLES

Publication

EP 0934107 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97942939 A

Priority

  • DE 19637791 A
  • EP 9705085 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9811970A1] The invention concerns a scented room with several seats for visitors, through which flows an air current with varying fragrances. The fragrance is blown into the scented room from the outside through a flowing channel which is independent from a room air conditioning current feeding a small amount of air. The air quantity fed is passed through at least one processing circuit placed outside the scented room, to which varying fragrance sources can be attached. The scented room is designed as a scent channel through which an air current can flow longitudinally.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63J 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63G 31/02 (2006.01); A63J 5/00 (2006.01); A63J 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63J 5/00 (2013.01); A63J 2005/008 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9811970 A1 19980326; AT 198053 T 20001215; DE 19637791 C1 19980409; EG 21085 A 20001031; EP 0934107 A1 19990811; EP 0934107 B1 20001213; JP 2001502933 A 20010306; US 6602463 B1 20030805

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-06-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100531

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090326

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090327

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-09-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050917

2003-09-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030917

2003-05-07 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020917

2003-03-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030331

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-09-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020917

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-07-16 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20010716

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-02-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010201

2001-01-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-01-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702770 20010118

2001-01-10 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO S.P.A.

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2000-12-13 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20001213

2000-12-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 198053 T 20001215

2000-01-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991122

1999-08-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990408

1999-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT