Global Patent Index - EP 0934131 B1

EP 0934131 B1 2002-11-06 - BENDING MACHINE

Title (en)

BENDING MACHINE

Title (de)

BIEGEMASCHINE

Title (fr)

MACHINE A CINTRER

Publication

EP 0934131 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98946327 A

Priority

  • DE 19736987 A
  • EP 9805145 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19736987A1] A bending machine for flat material has a frame, a bottom platen with its associated tool arranged on the frame and a top platen with its associated tool arranged on the frame. The bottom and top platens can be moved relative to one another for fixing the flat material. A bending platen has a bending platen tool holding fixture which can be equipped with a bending platen tool and which can swivel about an axis of rotation on the machine frame in order to bend flat material fixed by the top and bottom platens. In order to improve such a machine so that the bending platen tool can be bowed as easily as possible, the bending platen tool holding fixture is provided with adjustable bowing means which support one foot of the bending platen tool only in a partial area, seen in the bending direction, so that when bending forces are applied, the foot is essentially only supported on a rear bearing surface of the bending platen tool holding fixture.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 5/0272 (2013.01); B21D 5/04 (2013.01); B21D 5/042 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19736987 A1 19990311; AT 227175 T 20021115; DK 0934131 T3 20030310; EP 0934131 A1 19990811; EP 0934131 B1 20021106; ES 2186228 T3 20030501; JP 2001504761 A 20010410; PT 934131 E 20030331; US 6058756 A 20000509; WO 9910116 A1 19990304

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070813

2009-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070814

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070813

2008-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070814

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-08-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080301

2008-07-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-07-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080430

2008-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070813

2008-05-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070813

2008-05-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080213

2008-05-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080301

2008-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080301

2008-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070814

2008-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070813

2008-04-21 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2008-04-15 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-02-29 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *REINHARDT MASCHINENBAU G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-02-27 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20080213

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060815

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-11-09 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20061109

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-09-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060927

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-08-15 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20060815

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-08-03 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20060803

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-07-21 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060721

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-15 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060615

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-12 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060612

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-07 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060607

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060602

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-05-24 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20060524

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2186228 T3

2003-04-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-03-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20030206

2003-03-10 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806182 20021212

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227175 T 20021115

2001-12-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011025

1999-08-18 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

1999-08-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990423

1999-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE