Global Patent Index - EP 0934164 B1

EP 0934164 B1 2000-12-27 - ROTARY PRESS DOCTOR

Title (en)

ROTARY PRESS DOCTOR

Title (de)

RAKEL FÜR EINE ROTATIONSDRUCKMASCHINE

Title (fr)

RACLE POUR ROTATIVE

Publication

EP 0934164 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97945760 A

Priority

  • DE 9702395 W
  • DE 19644370 A
  • DE 19725061 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: RU2193488C2] FIELD: printing industry. SUBSTANCE: squeegee plate is manufactured from metal coated with substance having low surface energy. Squeegee plate is positioned at negative angle with respect to cylinder defined by netted surface. Coat having surface energy within the range of 10-60 mN/m is applied to outer surface of squeegee plate facing cylindrical netted surface. Such construction prevents ink from accumulation on squeegee plate. Squeegee may be used in inking unit of rotary printing machine. EFFECT: increased efficiency and simplified construction. 27 cl, 2 dwg

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 9/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 9/10 (2006.01); B41F 31/02 (2006.01); B41N 10/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/027 (2013.01); Y10T 428/3154 (2015.04); Y10T 428/31544 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29718387 U1 19980122; BR 9712445 A 19991019; CN 1110413 C 20030604; CN 1234771 A 19991110; EP 0934164 A1 19990811; EP 0934164 B1 20001227; ES 2154058 T3 20010316; JP 2000507523 A 20000620; RU 2193488 C2 20021127; US 6335098 B1 20020101; WO 9818625 A1 19980507

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071017

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081212

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071017

2008-10-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080630

2008-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071017

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061018

2008-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20061018

2007-06-19 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-10-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061018

2006-09-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060926

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-09-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060922

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-10-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20051024

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-10-19 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20051019

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-10-13 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20051013

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2154058 T3

2001-02-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-02-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010116

2001-01-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2000-12-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2000-05-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000406

1999-08-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990521

1999-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE