Global Patent Index - EP 0934197 B1

EP 0934197 B1 2000-12-13 - PROCESS AND EQUIPMENT FOR WRAPPING PRODUCTS WITH STRETCHABLE FILM

Title (en)

PROCESS AND EQUIPMENT FOR WRAPPING PRODUCTS WITH STRETCHABLE FILM

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUM VERPACKEN VON GEGENSTÄNDEN MITTELS DEHNFOLIE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET EQUIPEMENT POUR ENVELOPPER DES PRODUITS AVEC UN FILM ETIRABLE

Publication

EP 0934197 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97942934 A

Priority

  • EP 9705061 W
  • IT BO960473 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9813262A1] Each movement in the various operating phases of a wrapping machine which involve stretchable film is carried out with variable motion with continuous and cyclic change, with precise accelerations and decelerations, in such a way as to ensure the attainment of the best compromise between the highest rate of execution of the said phases and the greatest use of the stretchability of the film without the yielding and rupture of the film used. For this purpose, the motors of the various operating elements of the machine are of the type with electronic control of speed and phase and are driven by suitable electronic circuit boards connected to the processor which controls the operation of the wrapping machine. Means are also provided to enable the processor of the machine to automatically adapt its operating program when there are variations of temperature and ambient humidity and also when there are variations of the physical characteristics of the stretchable film used.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 11/54; B65B 57/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 11/54 (2006.01); B65B 57/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 57/00 (2013.01); B65B 11/54 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9813262 A1 19980402; DE 69703701 D1 20010118; DE 69703701 T2 20010412; EP 0934197 A1 19990811; EP 0934197 B1 20001213; ES 2152704 T3 20010201; IT 1286231 B1 19980708; IT BO960473 A1 19980324; IT BO960473 D0 19960924

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160919

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-09-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-08-29 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: GRUPPO FABBRI VIGNOLA S.P.A., IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

- Effective date: 20140725

2014-07-14 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: GRUPPO FABBRI VIGNOLA S.P.A

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20140708

2014-07-10 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GRUPPO FABBRI VIGNOLA S.P.A., IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 69703701

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140528

2014-07-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69703701

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BUSCHHOFF-HENNICKE-ALTHAUS, DE

- Effective date: 20140528

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-12-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-02-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2152704

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-01-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69703701

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-01-18

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2000-04-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000218

1999-08-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990324

1999-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB