Global Patent Index - EP 0934378 B1

EP 0934378 B1 2003-06-11 - DETERGENT COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING A MIXTURE OF CATIONIC, ANIONIC AND NONIONIC SURFACTANTS

Title (en)

DETERGENT COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING A MIXTURE OF CATIONIC, ANIONIC AND NONIONIC SURFACTANTS

Title (de)

WASCHMITTEL ENTHALTEND EIN GEMISCH AUS KATIONISCHEN, ANIONISCHEN UND NICHTIONISCHEN TENSIDEN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS DETERGENTES COMPRENANT UN MELANGE DE TENSIOACTIFS CATIONIQUES, ANIONIQUES ET NON IONIQUES

Publication

EP 0934378 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97912665 A

Priority

  • GB 9621791 A
  • GB 9621799 A
  • GB 9705815 A
  • US 9717782 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9817755A1] The present invention relates to detergent compositions or components thereof containing one or more cationic surfactants of the formula: R<1>R<2>R<3>R<4>N<+> X<->, in which R<1> is a hydroxyalkyl group having no greater than 6 carbon atoms; each of R<2> and R<3> is independently selected from C1-4 alkyl or alkenyl; R<4> is a C5-11 alkyl or alkenyl; and X<-> is a counterion and a nonionic and/or anionic surfactant. The compositions of the invention produce viscous foam which has fabric care benefits.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 1/62; C11D 1/14; C11D 1/22; C11D 1/65; C11D 1/72; C11D 1/835; C11D 1/86

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 1/22 (2006.01); C11D 1/28 (2006.01); C11D 1/62 (2006.01); C11D 1/65 (2006.01); C11D 1/66 (2006.01); C11D 1/835 (2006.01); C11D 1/86 (2006.01); C11D 3/10 (2006.01); C11D 3/12 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 3/386 (2006.01); C11D 3/39 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01); C11D 17/06 (2006.01); C11D 1/14 (2006.01); C11D 1/52 (2006.01); C11D 1/72 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/38645 (2013.01); C11D 1/22 (2013.01); C11D 1/28 (2013.01); C11D 1/62 (2013.01); C11D 1/65 (2013.01); C11D 1/66 (2013.01); C11D 1/835 (2013.01); C11D 1/86 (2013.01); C11D 3/10 (2013.01); C11D 3/1273 (2013.01); C11D 3/128 (2013.01); C11D 3/37 (2013.01); C11D 3/3723 (2013.01); C11D 3/3942 (2013.01); C11D 3/3945 (2013.01); C11D 17/0069 (2013.01); C11D 17/065 (2013.01); C11D 1/143 (2013.01); C11D 1/146 (2013.01); C11D 1/525 (2013.01); C11D 1/662 (2013.01); C11D 1/72 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9817755 A1 19980430; AR 010004 A1 20000517; AT 242797 T 20030615; BR 9712541 A 20001024; CA 2268618 A1 19980430; DE 69722802 D1 20030717; DE 69722802 T2 20040519; EP 0934378 A1 19990811; EP 0934378 A4 19991215; EP 0934378 B1 20030611; ES 2195124 T3 20031201; JP 2000504067 A 20000404; MX 9903683 A 19990901

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151002

2016-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151002

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140925

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111002

2012-08-09 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69722802

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120501

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101016

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101029

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-07-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090501

2009-07-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090630

2009-07-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090501

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030611

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071004

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070920

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: THE *PROCTER & GAMBLE CY

- Effective date: 20051031

2007-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20051003

2005-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-03 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051003

2004-11-05 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20041105

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-10-27 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20041027

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-10-22 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20041022

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-07-28 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040312

2004-04-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-10-15 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030403545

2003-10-02 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031002

2003-10-02 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031002

2003-09-11 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030911

2003-09-11 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030911

2003-09-11 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030911

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69722802 P 20030717

2003-07-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-06-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2003-06-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-06-11 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030611

2003-06-11 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030611

2003-06-11 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030611

2003-06-11 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030611

2000-11-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000925

1999-12-15 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19991102

1999-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

1999-12-15 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 6C 11D 1/62 A, 6C 11D 1/14 B, 6C 11D 1/22 B, 6C 11D 1/86 B, 6C 11D 1/72 B, 6C 11D 1/65 B, 6C 11D 1/835 B

1999-08-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990419

1999-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE