Global Patent Index - EP 0934394 B1

EP 0934394 B1 2001-05-30 - CLEANING RE-USABLE PLASTICS CONTAINERS OR RE-USABLE PLASTICS-COATED GLASS CONTAINERS

Title (en)

CLEANING RE-USABLE PLASTICS CONTAINERS OR RE-USABLE PLASTICS-COATED GLASS CONTAINERS

Title (de)

REINIGUNG VON KUNSTSTOFF-MEHRWEGGEBINDEN ODER KUNSTSTOFFBESCHICHTETEN MEHRWEGGLASGEBINDEN

Title (fr)

NETTOYER DES EMBALLAGES PLASTIQUES CONSIGNES OU DES EMBALLAGES CONSIGNES, EN VERRE RECOUVERT DE PLASTIQUE

Publication

EP 0934394 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97910414 A

Priority

  • DE 19642600 A
  • EP 9705476 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19642600A1] The invention concerns cleaning agents for re-usable plastics containers or re-usable plastics-coated glass containers, which cleaning agents contain at least one complexing agent. The invention also concerns a method of cleaning the containers. The complexing agent helps to eliminate or prevent yellowish-brown discoloration and changes in smell caused by the washing liquor conventionally used in the foodstuffs industry.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 7/26; C11D 7/32; C11D 7/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 7/26 (2006.01); C11D 3/20 (2006.01); C11D 3/22 (2006.01); C11D 3/33 (2006.01); C11D 3/36 (2006.01); C11D 7/32 (2006.01); C11D 7/36 (2006.01); C11D 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/33 (2013.01); C11D 3/2082 (2013.01); C11D 3/2086 (2013.01); C11D 3/222 (2013.01); C11D 3/361 (2013.01); C11D 3/364 (2013.01); C11D 11/0035 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19642600 A1 19980423; AT 201712 T 20010615; DK 0934394 T3 20010827; EP 0934394 A1 19990811; EP 0934394 B1 20010530; ES 2158518 T3 20010901; JP 2001504526 A 20010403; NO 991792 A 19990415; NO 991792 D0 19990415; WO 9816616 A1 19980423

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071006

2009-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061031

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061007

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2008-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20061007

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HENKEL-ECOLAB G.M.B.H. & CO. OHG

- Effective date: 20061031

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061006

2007-07-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070629

2007-07-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070501

2007-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061006

2007-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070501

2007-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070501

2006-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-10-06 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061006

2005-12-16 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20051216

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-11-04 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20051104

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051031

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-10-14 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20051014

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-10-06 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051006

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-09-16 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20050916

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-09-16 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050916

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-09-14 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050914

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-09-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050914

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-09-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010814

2001-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2158518 T3

2001-08-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010830

2001-08-28 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2001-08-27 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59703691 20010705

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-05-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-05-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201712 T 20010615

2000-08-16 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: CLEANING RE-USABLE PLASTICS CONTAINERS OR RE-USABLE PLASTICS-COATED GLASS CONTAINERS

2000-01-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991206

1999-08-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990407

1999-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE