Global Patent Index - EP 0934451 B1

EP 0934451 B1 2000-08-16 - LOCKABLE TAMPERPROOF BOX

Title (en)

LOCKABLE TAMPERPROOF BOX

Title (de)

VERRIEGELBARER SICHERHEITSBEHÄLTER

Title (fr)

BO TE DE SECURITE VERROUILLABLE

Publication

EP 0934451 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97943721 A

Priority

  • CH 9700400 W
  • CH 259496 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9817883A1] The lockable tamperproof box (1) serves for sales presentation of compact-disk cassettes (5), audio tape cassettes, video cassettes, or the like. A special tool, such as a powerful magnet, is needed to unlock it. When the cassette (5) is inserted into an insertion aperture of the box (1), a rear part (7) of a locking device (6) is shifted in the direction of insertion into a lock-in position, and catches there automatically. In the process, a front part (8) of this device (6) is rotated about the direction of insertion by forced coupling with the rear part (7), and a locking element (8.2) mounted on the front part (8) is swivelled into the insertion aperture. The tamperproof box (1) can be filled automatically, and is self-locking.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 73/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 73/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 73/0023 (2013.01); Y10S 206/807 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT MC SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9817883 A1 19980430; AT 195572 T 20000915; AU 4548197 A 19980515; CA 2268935 A1 19980430; CA 2268935 C 20051206; CH 691071 A5 20010412; CN 1129698 C 20031203; CN 1234090 A 19991103; DE 59702218 D1 20000921; EP 0934451 A1 19990811; EP 0934451 B1 20000816; ES 2150790 T3 20001201; HU 0000398 A2 20000628; HU 0000398 A3 20020328; US 6336554 B1 20020108

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071023

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061024

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2008-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20061024

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061023

2007-07-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070629

2007-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061023

2007-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070501

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-11-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20051129

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-10-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051020

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-10-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051019

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-10-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051010

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-08-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2150790 T3

2000-11-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-11-16 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001116

2000-10-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20001031

2000-10-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BIANCHETTI - BRACCO - MINOJA S.R.L.

2000-10-23 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001023

2000-09-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702218 20000921

2000-09-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000816

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT MC SE

2000-08-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 195572 T 20000915

1999-10-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990910

1999-08-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990326

1999-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT MC SE