Global Patent Index - EP 0934493 A4

EP 0934493 A4 2002-09-11 - PURGED GROUNDED IMMERSION HEATER

Title (en)

PURGED GROUNDED IMMERSION HEATER

Title (de)

ENTLÜFTETER, GEERDETER TAUCHHEIZER

Title (fr)

THERMOPLONGEUR DOTE D'UNE MISE A LA TERRE ET D'UN SYSTEME DE PURGE

Publication

EP 0934493 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97913689 A

Priority

  • US 9718816 W
  • US 2792096 P

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24H 1/10; F24H 9/20; H05B 3/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/78 (2006.01); F24H 1/00 (2006.01); F24H 1/10 (2006.01); F24H 9/20 (2006.01); H05B 3/56 (2006.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 69734287 D1 20060209; DE 69734287 T2 20060706; EP 0934493 A1 19990811; EP 0934493 A4 20020911; EP 0934493 B1 20050928; JP 2002515112 A 20020521; JP 4001389 B2 20071031

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20171009

2017-11-01 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20171009

2017-10-10 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69734287

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161017

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161031

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-09-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2006-09-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060629

2006-05-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-02-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69734287 P 20060209

2005-09-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-09-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-04-13 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: IMMERSION HEATER FOR CORROSIVE FLUIDS AND USE THEREOF

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031124

2002-09-11 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020726

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-09-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 24H 1/10 A, 7F 24H 9/20 B, 7H 05B 3/56 B

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TOM RICHARDS, INC.

1999-08-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990506

1999-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT