Global Patent Index - EP 0934495 B1

EP 0934495 B1 2001-12-12 - BUILT-IN REFRIGERATING APPARATUS

Title (en)

BUILT-IN REFRIGERATING APPARATUS

Title (de)

EINBAU-KÄLTEGERÄT

Title (fr)

APPAREIL FRIGORIFIQUE ENCASTRABLE

Publication

EP 0934495 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97912183 A

Priority

  • DE 19644799 A
  • EP 9705666 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19644799A1] The invention relates to a built-in refrigerating apparatus (12) with a heat insulating case, which can be inserted into a furniture niche (10) which is enclosed by the lateral niche walls (11). The case has a door, which is supported by hinges in such a way that it can swing. One of the hinge arms is fixed to the door of the refrigerating apparatus, while the second hinge arm (14) is connected to the case, and a section (16) of it protrudes laterally above the apparatus case. This section faces the adjoining niche wall (11). The apparatus is provided with two spacers (18, 18') of different thicknesses, each of which can be individually fastened to the projecting hinge arm section (16) and can compensate a corresponding crack, caused by the different thicknesses of the lateral niche walls (11).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25D 23/10; E05D 7/04; E05D 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 11/00 (2006.01); F25D 23/10 (2006.01); E05D 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 11/00 (2013.01); F25D 23/10 (2013.01); E05D 7/04 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/20 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/31 (2013.01); F25D 2323/024 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19644799 A1 19980430; DK 0934495 T3 20020415; EP 0934495 A1 19990811; EP 0934495 B1 20011212; ES 2169852 T3 20020716; TR 199900750 T2 19990621; WO 9819120 A1 19980507

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-15 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59705807

2017-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151016

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161031

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-25 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20161125

2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151102

2016-07-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151015

2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151015

2016-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20160630

2016-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20151015

2015-11-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERATE GMBH

- Effective date: 20151022

2015-06-02 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERATE GMBH

- Effective date: 20150527

2015-05-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH, 81739 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59705807

- Effective date: 20150402

2015-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20141029

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20141024

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20141021

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-01-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20141024

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-06-06 [REG DK EBP] EP PATENT LAPSED

2005-05-31 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-11-01 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041101

2004-10-16 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041016

2003-10-22 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20031022

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-10-21 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20031021

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2169852 T3

2002-05-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-15 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-03-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020228

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59705807 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT SE

2000-04-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000223

1999-08-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990428

1999-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT SE