Global Patent Index - EP 0934499 B1

EP 0934499 B1 2000-05-24 - SIGHTING DEVICE FOR SMALL ARMS

Title (en)

SIGHTING DEVICE FOR SMALL ARMS

Title (de)

VISIEREINRICHTUNG FÜR HANDFEUERWAFFEN

Title (fr)

APPAREIL DE VISEE POUR ARME DE POING

Publication

EP 0934499 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97904918 A

Priority

  • AT 9700033 W
  • AT 34596 A
  • AT 136096 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9732176A1] The invention relates to a sighting device for small arms which comprises a rear sight and a fore sight. The rear sight (1) has a substantially trapezoidal section (6) which diverges downwards from an upper edge (5), and the fore sight (2) has a substantially triangular shape, the top point (10) thereof cutting into two the upper surface (7) of the trapezoidal rear sight section (6) with the result that there is a light gap (15, 16) between the sides (8, 9) of the trapezoidal rear sight section (6) and the sides (11, 12) of the triangular shape of the fore sight (2) in each case. The result is a sighting device which, during aiming, guides the eye quickly and precisely to the target.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41G 1/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41G 1/01 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41G 1/01 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9732176 A1 19970904; DE 59701786 D1 20000629; EP 0934499 A1 19990811; EP 0934499 B1 20000524; US 6058616 A 20000509

INPADOC legal status


2017-03-01 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20170224

2017-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-02-25 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59701786

2016-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-02-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-03-07 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Effective date: 20140204

2014-03-07 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: STEYR MANNLICHER GMBH, AT

- Effective date: 20140204

2014-02-06 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20140121

2014-01-29 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20140121

2014-01-23 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: STEYR MANNLICHER GMBH, AT

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: STEYR MANNLICHER HOLDING GMBH, WIENER NEUSTADT, AT

- Document: DE 59701786

- Effective date: 20131128

2014-01-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59701786

- Representative's name: V. FUENER EBBINGHAUS FINCK HANO, DE

- Effective date: 20131128

2013-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE SCHAAD, BALASS, MENZL AND PARTN, CH

2013-12-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: STEYR MANNLICHER GMBH, AT

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: STEYR MANNLICHER HOLDING GMBH, AT

2011-03-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: STEYR MANNLICHER HOLDING GMBH

- Free text: STEYR MANNLICHER HOLDING GMBH#EYERSPERGRING 4/5#2700 WIENER NEUSTADT (AT) -TRANSFER TO- STEYR MANNLICHER HOLDING GMBH#EYERSPERGRING 4/5#2700 WIENER NEUSTADT (AT)

2004-04-16 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2004-04-16 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2004-04-16 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

2004-04-16 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-02-02 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: CURA INVESTHOLDING GMBH

2004-02-02 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: SDP LANDHOLDINGS GMBH

2004-02-02 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: STEYR MANNLICHER HOLDING GMBH

2003-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ANDRE ROLAND CONSEILS EN PROPRIETE INTELLECTUELLE

2003-12-31 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: STEYR MANNLICHER HOLDING GMBH

- Free text: STEYR-DAIMLER-PUCH AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT#FRANZ-JOSEFS-KAI 51#1010 WIEN (AT) -TRANSFER TO- STEYR MANNLICHER HOLDING GMBH#EYERSPERGRING 4/5#2700 WIENER NEUSTADT (AT)

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701786 20000629

2000-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI NL

1999-11-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991001

1999-08-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980810

1999-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI NL