Global Patent Index - EP 0934711 B1

EP 0934711 B1 2000-11-29 - Cupboard or shelf furniture

Title (en)

Cupboard or shelf furniture

Title (de)

Kasten- oder Regalmöbel

Title (fr)

Meuble comprenant un placard ou des étagères

Publication

EP 0934711 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98101689 A

Priority

EP 98101689 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0934711A1] The base section (2) of the support structure has three cantilevered arms (14-16) on one plane and opening into a joint (17). The free ends of the cantilevered arms have vertically upward protruding, straight, H-sectioned uprights (3-5) opening into a ceiling section (6) which also has three cantilevered arms (18-20) on one plane and opening into a joint. The cantilevered arms of the base and ceiling sections are arranged in a T shape or star shape. Flat or curved cladding panels made of wood, plastic, glass or metal are joined to the exterior of the support structure.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 47/00; A47B 47/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 47/00 (2006.01); A47B 47/05 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 47/005 (2013.01); A47B 47/05 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29815156 U1 19990121; AT 197754 T 20001215; DE 59800365 D1 20010104; EP 0934711 A1 19990811; EP 0934711 B1 20001129

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2015-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150131

2015-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150131

2015-08-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-10-23 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59800365

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59800365

2014-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140130

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-03-14 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: WELLIS MOEBELFABRIK AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: WELLIS AG, MOEBELFABRIK, WILLISAU, CH

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130123

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120117

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-02-29 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: WELLIS AG, MOEBELFABRIK, WILLISAU

- Free text: WELLIS AG, MOEBELFABRIK, WILLISAU#ETTISWILERSTRASSE 24#6130 WILLISAU (CH) -TRANSFER TO- WELLIS AG, MOEBELFABRIK, WILLISAU#ETTISWILERSTRASSE 24#6130 WILLISAU (CH)

2009-02-27 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-10-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080801

2008-10-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080801

2008-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *TEAM MOBEL A.G.

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-01-02 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070314

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-03-14 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070314

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-01-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070111

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-01-03 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070103

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-04-13 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: WELLIS AG, MOEBELFABRIK, WILLISAU

- Free text: TEAM MOEBEL AG#ETTISWILERSTRASSE 24#6130 WILLISAU (CH) -TRANSFER TO- WELLIS AG, MOEBELFABRIK, WILLISAU#ETTISWILERSTRASSE 24#6130 WILLISAU (CH)

2002-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KEMENY AG PATENTANWALTBUERO

2001-11-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-04-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-02-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. ZINI MARANESI & C. S.R.L.

2001-01-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800365 20010104

2000-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE IT LI NL

2000-11-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 197754 T 20001215

2000-05-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE IT LI NL

2000-04-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK IT LI

1999-10-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990910

1999-08-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990322

1999-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE IT LI NL

1999-08-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI