Global Patent Index - EP 0934779 A3

EP 0934779 A3 2000-10-18 - Apparatus for cleaning tubular scaffolding frames

Title (en)

Apparatus for cleaning tubular scaffolding frames

Title (de)

Gerät zum Reinigen von Gerüstrohrrahmen

Title (fr)

Appareil pour nettoyer des cadres d'échafaudage tubulaires

Publication

EP 0934779 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99102207 A

Priority

DE 19804228 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19804228C1] The foremost scraping component (2) in the scraping direction, viewed laterally, is fixed inclined towards the frame (1) and has an inclined ground cutting edge, which forms a small acute angle with the surface of the scaffolding tube to be cleaned. Several scraper components (3,4) arranged in the scraping direction (9) behind the foremost scraper component are fixed vertically under the frame but in plan view are inclined to the axis of the scaffolding tube to be cleaned. The scraper component (5) fitted in the scraping direction to the rear end of the frame is arranged both vertically to the frame and also vertically to the axis of the scaffolding tube to be cleaned.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B08B 9/02; B08B 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B08B 1/00 (2006.01); B08B 9/02 (2006.01); B08B 9/023 (2006.01); E04G 5/00 (2006.01); E04G 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B08B 9/023 (2013.01); B08B 1/00 (2013.01); E04G 5/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29808485 U1 19980917; DE 19804228 C1 19990225; EP 0934779 A2 19990811; EP 0934779 A3 20001018; JP H11315632 A 19991116; US 6243910 B1 20010612

INPADOC legal status


2006-09-15 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1024436

2003-09-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030320

2002-10-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020909

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010711

2001-08-09 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-07-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH ES FR GB IT LI

2000-10-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH ES FR GB IT LI

1999-08-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI