Global Patent Index - EP 0934888 B1

EP 0934888 B1 2003-06-04 - Packaging device for pots of cottage cheese

Title (en)

Packaging device for pots of cottage cheese

Title (de)

Verpackungsvorrichtung für Frischkäsebecher

Title (fr)

Dispositif de conditionnement de pots d'emballage de fromage blanc

Publication

EP 0934888 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 99400276 A

Priority

FR 9801458 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0934888A1] The packaging device for soft cheese pots is constituted by a basket with a bottom (2). A central truncated protuberance (4) is raised from the bottom which defines with the basket walls (3A-3D) four housings each intended to receive a pot. The top of the protuberance has a plane surface (7) extending parallel to the basket bottom. The peripheral edge of each pot is supported on this plane surface. Hooks (9) on the plane surface engage the lower edge of each pot cover and bosses (11) in the lower part of the housings clamp the lower edge of each pot.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 71/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/50 (2006.01); B65D 71/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/50 (2013.01); B65D 71/0003 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0934888 A1 19990811; EP 0934888 B1 20030604; DE 69908438 D1 20030710; DE 69908438 T2 20040429; ES 2201640 T3 20040316; FR 2774660 A1 19990813; FR 2774660 B1 20000317

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180215

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-02-15 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150209

2016-03-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160329

2016-02-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150901

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150208

2015-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150228

2015-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150228

2015-09-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150901

2015-09-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-09-02 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150901

2015-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69908438

2015-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150228

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140227

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-05-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140226

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-05-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20140218

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140218

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20140218

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-04-26 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: PLEX, FR

- Effective date: 20130312

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2201640 T3

2003-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ALTHOFF PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69908438 P 20030710

2003-06-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL

2003-03-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: FINANCIERE DE LA BOURBRE

2001-10-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010912

2000-08-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: "PLEX"

2000-08-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ODDOUX, CLAUDE

2000-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000211

2000-04-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL

2000-04-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

1999-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR IT LI NL

1999-08-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI